CA AB1629 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 568 of, and to add Sections 412 and 569 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, to add Sections 12802.10 and 16428.86 to the Government Code, to amend Section 39712 of, and to add and repeal Section 44274.3 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 6009.1, 42997, and 42999 of, and to add Sections 717 and 4799.05 to, the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 399.20.3 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources: greenhouse emissions and biomass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1629 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5433.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4584.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 412 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 568 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 569 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12802.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16428.86 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44274.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42997 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42999 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4799.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6009.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 717 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.20.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |