CA AB1629 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17140.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxation: exclusion: military survivor benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17140.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |