CA AB1640 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 71133, 71134, 71135, and 71136 to the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Office of Planning and Research: regional climate networks: regional climate adaptation and resilience action plans.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Bennett [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1640 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1640 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q., N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 21). |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71133 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71135 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71136 | New Code | See Bill Text |