CA AB1643 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 653.5 and 654.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: informal supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1643 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Menjivar (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1643 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1643 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2355.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 8. Page 1491.) |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 3). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 653.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 654.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |