CA AB1648 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1808.1, 12804.9, and 15278 of, to add Section 12804.11 to, and to repeal Sections 12954, 15250.6, and 15250.7 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: firefighter's operation of firefighting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1648 JEFFRIES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1648 Jeffries By Emmerson (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1648 JEFFRIES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1648 Jeffries By Emmerson (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1648 JEFFRIES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6707.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6748.) | |
2010-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-25 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4859.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-18 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-12 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-14 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-05-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5054.) | |
2010-05-04 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (April 28). | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-01-14 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | |
2010-01-13 | Read first time. To print. |