CA AB1648 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-21 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-21 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 84305.5, 84504, and 84505 of, to add Sections 84506.1, 84506.2, and 84506.3 to, to repeal Sections 84502, 84503, and 84506.5 of, and to repeal and add Sections 84501, 84506, 84507, and 84508 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and calling a special election to be consolidated with the November 4, 2014, statewide general election, to take effect immediately as an act calling an election.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: advertisements: disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1648 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - AB 1648 BROWNLEY Third Reading Urgency Amend By BROWNLEY Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1648 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading Amend By BROWNLEY Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - AB 1648 BROWNLEY Third Reading Urgency Amend By BROWNLEY Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1648 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading Amend By BROWNLEY Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6005.) | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5961.) | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5177.) | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-21 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 27). | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2012-02-14 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | |
2012-02-13 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84305.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84502 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84503 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84506.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84506.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84506.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84506.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |