CA AB1648 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14902 of, and to add Section 14900.5 to, the Government Code, relating to state publications.
Title
State publications: distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A. & A.R. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14900.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |