CA AB1651 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49414 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: emergency medical care: epinephrine auto-injectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Special Consent AB1651 Sanchez et al. By Archuleta (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1651 Sanchez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1651 Sanchez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2691.). |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1463.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |