CA AB1674 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 111070 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Vended water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |