CA AB169 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30061 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 6024 and 13800 of, and to repeal Section 13812 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 209, 1961, 1962, 1980, 1981, 1982, 1984, 1991, 2200, and 8261 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 1.6 (commencing with Section 1980) of Division 2.5 of, to add Section 2202 to, to repeal Section 13704 of, and to repeal Article 5.3 (commencing with Section 1785) of Chapter 1 of Division 2.5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety juvenile justice trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Assembly - AB 169 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GABRIEL (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB169 BUDGET (Gabriel) By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 169 Budget Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB169 BUDGET (Gabriel) By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 169 Budget Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 863.) |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.) |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 30061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13812 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13704 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1961 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1981 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1982 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1984 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1991 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 2200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 2202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |