CA AB1690 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65583.2 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Local planning: housing elements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1690 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1690 Gordon By Beall (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1690 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1690 Gordon By Beall (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1690 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6350.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4706.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4960.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |