CA AB1722 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7504, 7504.2, 7506.5, 7506.9, 7507.3, 7507.9, and 7507.12 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 14602.8 and 22651 of the Vehicle Code, relating to collateral recovery.
Title
Collateral recovery.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-13 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | |
2010-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2010-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |