CA AB1736 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17141.5 and 17204.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: deduction: homeownership savings accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17141.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17204.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |