CA AB1736 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1294 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Evidence: hearsay: prior inconsistent statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1736 Cunningham By Wiener (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Assembly - AB 1736 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Assembly - AB 1736 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4825.). |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4066.) |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1294 | Amended Code | Citation Text |