CA AB174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5922 of the Corporations Code, and to add and repeal Section 100509 of the Government Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 174 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB174 Wood By Monning (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 174 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB174 Wood By Monning (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 174 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3161.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 6). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2510.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1920.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX. |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 5922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100509 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |