CA AB175 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14132.725 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to telemedicine.
Title
Medical telemedicine: optometrists.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Dean Florez [D] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Abel Maldonado [R] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 175 GALGIANI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-09-04 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB175 Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 175 GALGIANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-04 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB175 Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 175 GALGIANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3174.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2223.) | |
2009-09-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11)) | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1620.) | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13). | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-22 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. | |
2009-01-30 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | |
2009-01-29 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |