CA AB175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26122 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis marketing: packaging and labeling.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 175 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 175 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1956.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26122 | New Code | See Bill Text |