CA AB175 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2924h and 2924m of the Civil Code, to add Section 3332.2 to the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Section 54234 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 50218.6, 50220.7, 50220.8, 50515.08, 50515.09, and 50515.10 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Housing: mortgages and deeds of trust: use of state property: surplus land disposal: financing programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 175 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB175 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 175 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB175 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 175 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3055.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3049.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 2578.). |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 7). |
2021-09-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2303.) |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2302.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 499.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 3332.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 54234 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50218.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50220.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50220.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50515.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50515.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50515.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |