CA AB1755 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 739.1 and 739.9 of, and to add Section 739.11 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: rates.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1755 PEREA Assembly Third Reading By BRADFORD (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1755 PEREA Assembly Third Reading By BRADFORD (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 7. Page 4876.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-05-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-24 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 16). | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2012-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 739.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |