CA AB1755 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1280.15 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Medical information.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 1755 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1755 Gomez By Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1755 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1755 Gomez By Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1755 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6035.). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1755.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5094.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1280.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |