CA AB1775 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18601, 18633, 18633.5, and 23281 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Income taxes: returns: due dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1775 Obernolte By Moorlach (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1775 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1775 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5019.). |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18633 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18633.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23224 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |