CA AB1799 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65965 and 65966 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: mitigation lands.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Nora Campos [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65966 | Amended Code | Citation Text |