CA AB1799 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2084 of the Insurance Code, relating to fire insurance.
Title
Insurance: policy documents.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1799 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1799 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1799 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4880.). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 2084 | Amended Code | Citation Text |