CA AB1810 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21628.2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 11106, 12001, 12021.3, 12071, 12072, 12073, 12076, 12077, 12077.5, 12078, and 12082 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Feuer [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1810 Feuer By DeSaulnier (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1810 Feuer Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1810 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1810 Feuer Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1810 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Died on Senate inactive file. | |
2010-08-31 | To inactive file on motion of Senator DeSaulnier. | |
2010-08-30 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 5032.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5032.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14) | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-06-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 5584.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-06 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2010-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |