CA AB1847 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 52.5 and 1587 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 328, 352, 372, 373, and 1447 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 56850 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 2310, 2312, 2313, 2332, and 7901 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 854.2, 1001, 6276.30, 6276.34, 6276.38, 7579.1, 12428, 26640, 26643, and 26749 of, and to repeal Section 203 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1250, 1250.2, 1267.8, 1275.5, 1276.5, 1276.9, 1505.5, 1566.3, 1568.0831, 1569.5, 1569.85, 11812.6, 11834.23, 13113, 36130, 50680, 50684, 50685.5, 50688, and 50689 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10235.8 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 4662 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 2672 and 11151 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 9201 and 19201 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 734 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 5301, 18014, 18395, and 35466 of the Streets and Highways Code, to amend Section 26306 of the Water Code, and to amend Sections 1752.6, 1756, 4011, 4016, 4021, 4022, 4042, 4080, 4109.5, 4119, 4120, 4121, 4132, 4136, 4200, 4202.5, 4240, 4241, 4243, 4244, 4304, 4308, 4320, 4410, 4417, 4440, 4681.1, 5002, 5004, 5004.5, 5115, 5116, 5250, 5301, 5304, 5326.5, 5340, 5350, 5400, 5500, 5511, 5585.10, 5600, 5653, 5696, 5699, 5714, 5802, 6000, 6002, 6002.10, 6250, 6254, 6551, 6825, 7100, 7200, 7201, 7226, 7227, 7275, 7276, 7277, 7278, 7280, 7283, 7284, 7294, 7300, 7329, 7352, 7354, 7357, 7362, 7500, and 7501.5 of, and to repeal Section 5366 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health disorders.
Title
Mental health disorders: language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Assembly - AB 1847 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1847 Chesbro (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1847 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1847 Chesbro (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1847 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5733.). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4995.) |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |