CA AB1852 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54956.96 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Joint powers agencies: Clean Power Alliance of Southern California: meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1852 Pacheco et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Assembly - AB 1852 Pacheco Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Assembly - AB 1852 Pacheco Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-06-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-06-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2024-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4630.) |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54956.96 | Amended Code | Citation Text |