CA AB1870 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 890, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 890, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1777.5 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: prevailing wage: multiemployer apprenticeship program grants.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AB 1870 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1870 Alejo By Hueso (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1870 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1870 Alejo By Hueso (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1870 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 890, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6723.). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4608.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 4955.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 7). |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1777.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |