CA AB1883 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 7 (commencing with Section 18974) of Chapter 11 of Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child sexual abuse, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Child sexual abuse: prevention pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1883 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1883 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1883 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1883 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 5229.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5229.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 5146.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cooley. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18974 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |