CA AB1915 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17053.86 and 23686 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: music production companies.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |