CA AB1915 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2333.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Safe routes to school.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1915 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1915 Alejo By Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1915 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1915 Alejo By Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1915 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6307.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4703.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4823.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2012-03-27 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 110460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 113400 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 113789 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2333.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |