CA AB1915 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49414.3 of, and to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 49478) to Chapter 9 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: drug education: opioid overdose training program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49414.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49478 | New Code | See Bill Text |