CA AB1926 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9855 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to service contracts.
Title
Service contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - AB 1926 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - AB 1926 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-04-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4488.) | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18). | |
2012-03-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |