CA AB1945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 16428.87 and 16428.88 to the Government Code, and to amend Sections 39712 and 39720 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: investment plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1945 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1945 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hueso (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1945 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hueso (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1945 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1945 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hueso (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1945 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hueso (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1945 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 7027.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 6010.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 5549.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 7. Page 5523.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 16). |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16428.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16428.88 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39716 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |