CA AB1955 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 42238.054 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: Healthy Kids, Healthy Minds Demonstration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 2.) (April 29). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42238.054 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |