CA AB1956 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19348 of, and to add Section 19348.2 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to wildlife.
Title
California condors: feeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1956 MONNING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1956 Monning By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-17 - Assembly - AB 1956 MONNING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1956 Monning By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1956 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1956 Monning By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-17 - Assembly - AB 1956 MONNING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1956 Monning By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1956 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6658.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 4839.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | In Senate. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-19 | Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments. Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2010-08-18 | Withdrawn from Enrollment. | |
2010-08-17 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6282.) | |
2010-08-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4497.) | |
2010-08-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2010-05-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4793.) | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-25 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-24 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2010-03-17 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-03-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |