CA AB1992 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 472.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1795.92 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 26509 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 1803.5 of, to repeal Section 232 of, and to repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 3000) of Division 2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to the New Motor Vehicle Board.
Title
New Motor Vehicle Board: repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 0 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 0 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and TRANS. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 472.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1795.92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 1803.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 232 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |