CA AB1992 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49458 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: physical examinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. In committee: Reconsideration refused. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on A., E., S., T., & I.M.) |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49458 | Amended Code | Citation Text |