CA AB2000 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-27 - Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-27 - Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 121690 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to rabies.
Title
Rabies: vaccinations.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 2000 HAGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 2000 HAGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.) | |
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-23 | Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by Committee. | |
2010-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5053.) | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28). | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |