CA AB2000 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 85200 of, and to add Sections 139.5 and 85090 to, the Water Code, relating to water, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-04-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2012-04-17 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 11108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11456 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11457 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11458 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 11915.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 139.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85090 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |