CA AB2000 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 675, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 675, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68130.5 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: exemption from nonresident tuition.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] |
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2000 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2000 Gomez By Lara (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2000 Gomez Lay on Table (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2000 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2000 Gomez By Lara (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2000 Gomez Lay on Table (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2000 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 675, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 6385.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 4708.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 5259.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68130.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 68130.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |