CA AB2000 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23109 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Motor vehicle speed contests and exhibitions of speed: offstreet parking facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] |
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2000 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2000 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2000 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2000 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2000 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4978.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4695.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |