CA AB2027 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69840 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Student financial aid: College Access Tax Credit Fund: community college student transfers: partnered Historically Black Colleges and Universities.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |