CA AB2060 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 1234) of Title 8 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to recidivism.
Title
Supervised Population Workforce Training Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2060 PEREZ, V.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB2060 V. Manuel P (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2060 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB2060 V. Manuel P (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2060 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6616.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6630.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4904.). |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5222.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15820.92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1234 | New Code | See Bill Text |