CA AB2060 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2001, 2007, and 2008 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to medicine.
Title
Medical Board of California.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (May 4). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |