CA AB2070 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cervantes.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cervantes.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66602 of the Education Code, relating to the California State University.
Title
Trustees of the California State University: faculty appointees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cervantes. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 17). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |