CA AB2072 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1357.503 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10753.05 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Group health care coverage: biomedical industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2072 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2072 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1357.503 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10753.05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |