CA AB2099 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 18997) of Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Safe drinking water benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2099 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2099 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 5100.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and E.S. & T.M. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18997 | New Code | See Bill Text |