CA AB2117 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65009 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Development permit expirations: actions or proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2117 Joe Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2117 Joe Patterson et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2117 Joe Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2117 Joe Patterson et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2117 Joe Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HOUSING. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |