CA AB2130 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 40215 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Parking violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2130 Santiago (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2130 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2130 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 40215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |