CA AB2151 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 488.5 and 557.5 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 16051 of the Vehicle Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: public safety employees: accidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2151 TORRES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2151 Torres By Correa (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2151 Torres Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2151 TORRES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2151 Torres By Correa (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2151 Torres Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2151 TORRES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-10 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6789.) | |
2010-08-26 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 26). | |
2010-08-25 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4833.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 31.) | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time and passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4686.) Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4686.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14) | |
2010-08-09 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-05-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5235.) | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12). | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. by unanimous consent. | |
2010-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-03-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |